BISHOP'S STORTFORD & DISTRICT TALKING NEWSPAPER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Provision of Recordings of the content of the Local Newspaper to those who are unable to read through blindness or similar infirmity
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 07 November 1979: Standard registration
- 22 March 2021: Funds received from 279558 THE HARLOW TALKING NEWSPAPER
- TALKING NEWSPAPER ASSOCIATION OF BISHOPS STORTFORD (Previous name)
- THE TALKING NEWSPAPER ASSOCIATION OF BISHOP'S STORTFORD (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NICHOLAS TURNER | Chair | 06 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM PAGE | Trustee | 06 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
TRACEY TAYLOR | Trustee | 12 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
DR BRIAN UNITT | Trustee | 11 June 2007 |
|
|||||
RODNEY ERNEST STOCK | Trustee | 16 July 2003 |
|
|||||
Richard Barnett | Trustee | 17 May 2002 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.11k | £639 | £443 | £770 | £922 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.54k | £2.18k | £1.01k | £593 | £754 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 20/09/1979 AS AMENDED ON 19/05/1999 AS AMENDED ON 16/05/2014
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE BLIND OR PARTIALLY OR THOSE LABOURING UNDER SOME TEMPRARY OR PERMANENT INCAPACITY OR DISABILITY WHICH MAKES READING A STRAIN, BY THE PROVISION OF RECORDED TAPES.
Area of benefit
BISHOP'S STORTFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
24 CHANTRY CLOSE
BISHOP'S STORTFORD
CM23 2SN
- Phone:
- 01279651270
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window