LOCHABER HALL COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the charity are, a) to promote the benefit of the inhabitants of the London Borough of Lewisham, b) to maintain and manage a centre for activities promoted by the Association.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Lewisham
Governance
- 08 November 1979: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JONATHAN WHITE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Ivo Dekkers | Trustee | 29 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Paul Damian Mooney | Trustee | 24 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Richard James McKay | Trustee | 24 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Elizabeth McKay | Trustee | 24 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Gerard Joseph Ambrose | Trustee | 24 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
REBECCA LOUISE VICARY | Trustee | 29 October 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.05k | £31.23k | £41.99k | £46.92k | £47.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.67k | £22.94k | £40.99k | £43.79k | £39.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £21.29k | £12.26k | £10.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 01 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 01 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 28 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 02 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 03 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14TH SEPTEMBER 1979 AS AMENDED 9TH JUNE 1993 as amended on 03 Nov 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE LONDON BOROUGH OF LEWISHAM AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CONSTITUTION).
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF LEWISHAM AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 MANOR LANE TERRACE
LONDON
SE13 5QL
- Phone:
- 07773800664
- Email:
- jprwmlt@aol.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window