Financial history NORTH BADDESLEY COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 278770
Charity reporting is up to date (5 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £19.80k £16.85k £9.22k £10.21k £17.84k
Total expenditure £14.48k £11.73k £11.86k £24.81k £28.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A £4.16k