Accounts and annual returns THE LORD MAYOR OF CANTERBURY'S CHRISTMAS GIFT FUND

Charity number: 278803
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 14 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 24 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 23 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 16 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 17 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required