CAMBRIDGESHIRE & HUNTINGDONSHIRE FAMILY HISTORY SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To record and preserve records relating to family history in the county of Cambridgeshire. To make those records available to the public. To educate the public in family history research.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 19 December 1979: Standard registration
- CAMBS FAMILY HISTORY SOCIETY (Working name)
- CFHS (Working name)
- CAMBRIDGESHIRE FAMILY HISTORY SOCIETY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MRS Gillian Shapland | Chair | 01 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
Leslie Potts | Trustee | 09 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Copsey | Trustee | 11 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Siddles | Trustee | 11 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Muriel Halliday | Trustee | 06 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE NORTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.19k | £37.51k | £37.56k | £34.41k | £40.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £78.51k | £51.29k | £34.47k | £30.64k | £35.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 22 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 04 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 17 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 10 NOVEMBER 1976 AS AMENDED 17 OCTOBER 1979 AS AMENDED 23RD MARCH 2005 as amended on 09 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE STUDY OF FAMILY HISTORY WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO GENEALOGY AND HERALDRY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
44 Bentham Way
ELY
CB6 1BS
- Phone:
- 0135366136
- Email:
- chairman@cfhs.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window