ABILITY UK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To assist people with special needs by optimising their health through purposeful leisure activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 06 November 1979: Standard registration
- 21 January 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- ABILITY (Working name)
- STACKPOLE TRUST (Previous name)
- STACKPOLE TRUST LIMITED (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2005 | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2008 | 31/12/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £359.11k | £166.24k | £51.15k | £4.25k | £1.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £330.89k | £183.40k | £36.16k | £2.63k | £1.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 22ND OCTOBER 1979 AS AMENDED 28TH AUG 1986, 13 MARCH 1996 AND 19 JUNE 1997.
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF DISABLED AND CHRONICALLY SICK PERSONS BY THE PROVISION OF RECUPERATIVE HOLIDAYS, FIELD STUDIES AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window