REACH VOLUNTEERING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide no or low-cost access to skills for resource-poor charities and public organisations, enabling them to reach their potential. To help people with career skills to use their talents and experience to secure a fulfilling volunteering role, in turn allowing charities to thrive and prosper. To provide a trustee recruitment service to charities and to professionals looking for a board role.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 06 November 1979: Standard registration
- REACH (Working name)
- RETIRED EXECUTIVES ACTION CLEARING-HOUSE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Piryanka Bedia Salamonczyk | Trustee | 26 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Francois Landers | Trustee | 15 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Keira Poland | Trustee | 15 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane Ide | Trustee | 18 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Deborah Morton-Dare | Trustee | 18 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gus Leon Alston | Trustee | 06 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Saskia Danielle Bewley | Trustee | 06 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kar Wai NG | Trustee | 06 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rachell Fox | Trustee | 19 June 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £499.00k | £531.00k | £346.00k | £449.39k | £479.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £453.17k | £448.38k | £296.18k | £449.06k | £459.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £5.20k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £351.74k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £174.06k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £5.20k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £429.25k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £19.13k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 21 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 5 OCTOBER 1979 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 26 JULY 1990, 12 DECEMBER 2002, 25 JUNE 2003 AND 14 MAY 2009 AND CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 10 SEPTEMBER 2003
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT AND DEVELOPMENT FOR VOLUNTARY AND PUBLIC ORGANISATIONS THROUGH TRAINING AND OPPORTUNITIES FOR VOLUNTARY WORK WITH THE APPROPRIATE ORGANISATIONS, AND OTHERWISE ENCOURAGE AND ASSIST PEOPLE WITH PROFESSIONAL OR CAREER SKILLS TO GIVE TIME AND USE THEIR SKILLS IN CONNECTION WITH THE FURTHERANCE OF CHARITABLE PURPOSES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
7
Bell Yard
London
- Phone:
- 02039439901
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window