Financial history THE FRANK PEARSON FOUNDATION

Charity number: 278884
Charity reporting is up to date (49 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £24.06k £19.41k £16.69k £19.42k £26.73k
Total expenditure £25.64k £32.50k £35.99k £9.64k £7.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A