THE MILITARY INTELLIGENCE MUSEUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The primary objective is to uphold the traditions of the Int Corps and perpetuate its deeds. To be one of the most exciting and intriguing military museums in the country by sharing the secret of military intelligence with a wide audience and educating future generations. To connect our past with our future and present bringing cost-effective and measurable benefits to the army and the nation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bedford
Governance
- 11 January 1980: Standard registration
- INTELLIGENCE CORPS MUSEUM (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £188.99k | £123.42k | £138.38k | £113.59k | £112.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £172.31k | £135.36k | £150.74k | £134.47k | £116.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 08 December 2023 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 08 December 2023 | 38 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 03/10/1979 AS AMENDED ON 01/05/2008 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 20/04/2011 AS AMENDED ON 19/01/2015
Charitable objects
(1) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC AND MEMBERS OF THE CORPS IN THE HISTORY AND MILITARY ACCOMPLISHMENTS OF THE CORPS; AND (2) TO PROMOTE MILITARY EFFICIENCY AND ENCOURAGE RECRUITMENT; BY THE PRESERVATION AND PUBLIC EXHIBITION OF THE COLLECTION IN A MUSEUM OR MUSEUMS OR SUCH OTHER PUBLIC PLACES AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Military Intelligence Museum
Chicksands
SHEFFORD
SG17 5PR
- Phone:
- 01462752896
- Email:
- mi-museum@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window