NORTHERN CHAMBER ORCHESTRA LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Performance to the public of orchestral and chamber concerts from the repertoire of classical and modern music, recording such music, co-operation with schools and colleges in the provisin of musical education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Blackburn With Darwen
- Bolton
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Derbyshire
- Lancashire
- Manchester City
- Sheffield City
- Stockport
- Warrington
Governance
- 12 December 1979: Standard registration
- N C O - N C O SINFONIA - N C O SOLOISTS (Working name)
- NORTHERN CHAMBER ORCHESTRA (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Gilks | Trustee | 09 February 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Thomas Philpott | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
John Phillips | Trustee | 19 November 2020 |
|
|||||||
Constantine Philip Biller | Trustee | 28 April 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Naomi Coverley | Trustee | 30 November 2018 |
|
|
||||||
JOHN BUSH | Trustee | 15 January 2016 |
|
|
||||||
STEPHEN THOMAS THRELFALL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
CONRAD MARSHALL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £258.43k | £156.70k | £244.43k | £158.09k | £265.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £206.81k | £130.19k | £270.03k | £211.17k | £289.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £71.54k | N/A | £36.43k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 10 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 10 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 16 July 2024 | 77 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 16 July 2024 | 77 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 26 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 26 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 19 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 19 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 24 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 22 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 19TH JUNE 1979 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 10 JAN 2018
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT AND FURTHERANCE OF PUBLIC EDUCATION THROUGH THE PROMOTION AND SUPPORT OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O WITHINGTON WORKS
30 BURTON ROAD
MANCHESTER
M20 3EB
- Phone:
- 0161 706 1990
- Email:
- info@ncorch.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window