WOKING CONCERT SOCIETY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing a chamber music series in Woking. Staffing a young musician performance competition. Occasional (music) education "workshops". Contributing to Surrey composers archives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
- Surrey
Governance
- 12 December 1979: Standard registration
- 06 August 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 06 August 2018: Funds transferred to 287647 WOKING MUSIC FESTIVAL
- WOKING MUSIC CLUB (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2013 | 31/05/2014 | 31/05/2015 | 31/05/2016 | 31/05/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.71k | £4.11k | £4.14k | £5.03k | £5.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.25k | £6.42k | £6.44k | £5.93k | £5.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2017 | 28 November 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2016 | 24 February 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2015 | 03 December 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 OCTOBER 1979 AS AMENDED ON 14TH MAY 1996
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF, THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window