FRIENDS OF ST NICHOLAS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
"The Friends of St Nicholas" was formed to collect funds for the maintenance of the fabric of the Church of St Nicholas, Godstone.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Surrey
Governance
- 17 December 1979: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicholas Charles Francis Barker | Chair | 10 November 2018 |
|
|||||
Alison McCormick | Trustee | 15 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Henriaetta Sara Griffiths | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
TONY CARTER | Trustee |
|
||||||
MICHAEL ANTHONY | Trustee |
|
||||||
MARIE OCTAVIA STUART-MENTETH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KAREN LESLEY MCLEAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.99k | £11.30k | £14.19k | £15.37k | £14.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.06k | £14.99k | £8.70k | £9.84k | £9.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 27 May 2024 | 112 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 14 February 2021 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 8TH NOVEMBER 1979 & AMENDED 4 NOVEMBER 2000.
Charitable objects
THE MAINTENANCE, REPAIR, IMPROVEMENT, RESTORATION, RECONSTRUCTION AND RENOVATION OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF ST NICHOLAS GODSTONE, ITS FURNITURE, ORNAMENTS, FABRIC, ORGAN AND CHURCHYARD AND ALL ITEMS COVERED BY THE ARCHITECT'S QUINQUENNIAL INSPECTION OF THE CHURCH, PREMIUMS FOR INSURANCE OF ALL SUCH ITEMS AND HEATING NECESSARY FOR THE MAINTENANCE OF THE FABRIC AND THE ORGAN.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF GODSTONE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 10
Stangrave Hall
Bletchingley Road
GODSTONE
Surrey
RH9 8NB
- Phone:
- 01883742655
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window