Financial history WORLD ARABIAN HORSE ORGANIZATION

Charity number: 278988
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £122.46k £124.29k £142.64k £144.29k £133.57k
Total expenditure £110.33k £111.12k £132.21k £130.18k £126.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A