MELROSE PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a Charitable Pre-school catering for children in our local area aged 2years to five years old. Supporting the families and following the Early Years Foundation Stage Curriculum. Ensuring that every child makes a good level of progress and thrives through play and exploration.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £211,919 from 1 government grant(s)
People

2 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Milton Keynes
Governance
- 28 February 1980: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CLAIRE CROW | Chair |
|
|
|||||
MRS DIANNE RUSSELLO | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £323.17k | £323.17k | £213.80k | £221.66k | £233.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £330.19k | £330.19k | £261.82k | £187.67k | £206.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £226.00k | £185.50k | £191.68k | £211.92k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 May 2024 | 112 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 May 2024 | 112 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 March 2023 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 07 March 2023 | 35 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 November 2022 | 296 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 November 2022 | 296 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2022 | 361 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2022 | 361 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28TH SEPTEMBER 1979 AS AMENDED 29TH NOVEMBER 1984
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN BELOW COMPULSORY SCHOOL AGE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE MILTON KEYNES BUCKINGHAMSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
MELROSE PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP
MELROSE AVENUE
BLETCHLEY
MILTON KEYNES
BUCKINGHAMSHIRE
- Phone:
- 01908642728
- Email:
- melrosepreschool@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window