NEWBERY LODGE PRE-SCHOOL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Operates Pre School, Tweenies (stepping stone from toddlers to pre-school), Toddler Group and Holiday Club
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Reading
Governance
- 17 January 1980: Standard registration
- 24 January 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- NEWBERY LODGE PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2013 | 31/01/2014 | 31/01/2015 | 31/01/2016 | 31/01/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £39.37k | £35.91k | £43.32k | £34.03k | £25.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.20k | £34.47k | £41.33k | £34.19k | £29.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £34.41k | £29.16k | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £1.27k | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2017 | 23 November 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2017 | 23 November 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 January 2016 | 30 November 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2016 | 30 November 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 January 2015 | 22 November 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2015 | 22 November 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 January 2014 | 23 August 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2014 | 23 August 2014 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11/09/1979 AS AMENDED ON 02/03/2011 AS AMENDED ON 01/03/2012 AS AMENDED ON 03/07/2015 AS AMENDED ON 28/11/2015 AS AMENDED ON 08/03/2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window