FRIENDS OF THE ROYAL LONDON HOSPITAL (WHITECHAPEL)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relieve patients and former patients of the Royal London Hospital (Whitechapel) who are sick, handicapped or infirm and generally to support the charitable work of the Hospital including related research
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

17 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Tower Hamlets
Governance
- 31 January 1980: Standard registration
- LEAGUE OF FRIENDS (Working name)
- FRIENDS OF THE LONDON HOSPITAL (WHITECHAPEL) (Previous name)
- FRIENDS OF THE ROYAL LONDON HOSPITAL (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JUDITH WALKER | Chair | 05 October 2015 |
|
|||||
Veronica Winslow | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Grace Zansanze Waters | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Jessie WARK | Trustee | 19 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Pearson Cantelo | Trustee | 19 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Paul Stanley Wright | Trustee | 24 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Neil Fletcher | Trustee | 27 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard Hugh GARDNER | Trustee | 20 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Shreeraj Kishorji LATURIA | Trustee | 20 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mary Mackintosh DENHOLM | Trustee | 18 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Evans | Trustee | 04 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jane Clark | Trustee | 04 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Janet Ridding | Trustee | 04 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
John Clark | Trustee | 04 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Professor T Beedham | Trustee | 01 October 2015 |
|
|||||
ELIZABETH JEAN ROBINSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUSAN KOPELMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £54.24k | £75.52k | £14.78k | £44.02k | £53.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.04k | £13.01k | £25.80k | £37.18k | £47.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 07 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 07 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 01 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 01 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 11 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 11 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7TH NOVEMBER 1979 AS AMENDED ON 05 MAY 2021 as amended on 20 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PATIENTS AND FORMER PATIENTS OF THE LONDON HOSPITAL (WHITECHAPEL) WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED OR INFIRM AND GENERALLY TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE SAID HOSPITAL INCLUDING MEDICAL RESEARCH
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
65 KNIGHTHEAD POINT
THE QUARTERDECK
LONDON
E14 8SS
- Phone:
- 07732727750
- Email:
- richardhgardner@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window