THE STOCK EXCHANGE RIFLE CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the instruction, training, and practice of both rifle and pistol shooting amongst members with a view to raising the standard of shooting amongst H.M. Subjects, for the better defence of the Realm.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Surrey
- Throughout London
Governance
- 12 February 1980: Standard registration
- 13 March 2024: Funds received from 209391 THE RIFLE AND REVOLVER CLUB
- STOCK EXCHANGE RIFLE CLUB (Previous name)
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Angela Georgina Fox | Chair | 08 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Vincent Hague | Trustee | 28 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tristan Jarrett | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Grant | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Jane McNiven | Trustee | 27 October 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £72.84k | £42.82k | £55.35k | £44.28k | £155.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £52.11k | £31.32k | £32.45k | £42.87k | £51.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 February 2025 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 11 February 2025 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 April 2024 | 84 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 April 2024 | 84 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 May 2023 | 103 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 October 2023 | 253 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 March 2022 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 March 2022 | 51 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES AS AMENDED 6TH NOVEMBER 1979
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE INSTRUCTION, TRAINING AND PRACTICE OF RIFLE AND PISTOL SHOOTING AMONGST MEMBERS OF THE STOCK EXCHANGE AND THEIR EMPLOYEES WITH A VIEW TO RAISING THE STANDARD OF SHOOTING AMONGST HER MAJESTY'S SUBJECTS FOR THE BETTER DEFENCE OF THE REALM.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
PO BOX 157
Rye Delivery Office
Cinque Ports Street
RYE
East Sussex
TN31 7AA
- Phone:
- 07906 098080
- Email:
- secretary@serc.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window