LOURDES FUND (GRAVESEND)

Charity Number: 279016
Charity reporting is overdue by 1297 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Fund Raising in order to send sick people to Lourdes

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2019

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Human Resources
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 December 1979: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Bridget Hardy Trustee 18 October 2012
None on record

Financial history

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 201 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 201 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 567 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 567 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 932 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 932 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1297 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1297 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 13 November 2020 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
13 ESSEX ROAD
GRAVESEND
DA11 0SL
Phone:
01474323664
Website:

No information available