THE HARROW DECORATIVE AND FINE ARTS SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We promote all aspects of the arts. We arrange lectures, study days and outings; pay fees and expenses of lecturers. We have set up online access to events. We hire premises for meetings and acquire equipment and software as needed. Arts activities sponsored: £500 each to St Luke's Hospice for Art Therapy, Uxendon Manor School for Mosaics Project, Headstone Manor Museum archiving/art workshops
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Harrow
Governance
- 15 October 1981: Standard registration
- H D F A S (Working name)
- THE ARTS SOCIETY HARROW (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PATRICIA ANNE SAVOURS | Chair | 08 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Susan Mary Piddington | Trustee | 28 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Huw Parry | Trustee | 08 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Jennings | Trustee | 08 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Geraldine Margaret Barton | Trustee | 08 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Marian Hilary Rummer | Trustee | 08 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
JILL THURLOW | Trustee | 24 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
GERALDINE SMITH | Trustee | 24 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
JANET MOORE | Trustee | 17 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
KAREN MEAD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.26k | £16.01k | £14.89k | £17.19k | £16.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.13k | £14.81k | £13.42k | £16.81k | £17.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 23 June 2024 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 02 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 09 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 04 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2ND JULY 1981
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION AND ADVANCEMENT OF THE AESTHETIC EDUCATION, THE CULTIVATION AND STUDY OF THE DECORATIVE AND FINE ARTS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND THE GIVING OF AID TO THE CONSERVATION OF OUR NATIONAL ARTISTIC HERITAGE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 Sylvia Avenue
PINNER
Middlesex
HA5 4QE
- Phone:
- 02084285756
- Email:
- harrow@theartssociety.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window