THANET CHAMBER CHOIR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Thanet Chamber Choir, in the socially deprived area of Thanet, performs four concerts a year of music from the Renaissance to the present day, one exclusively for charity. Rehearsals are once a week during school terms. Quiz nights are organised once or twice a year. Choir members of all ages come from Thanet or the nearer parts of Kent. The choir aims at musical excellence.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kent
Governance
- 05 December 1979: Standard registration
- THE SEVENTY CHAMBER CHOIR OF THANET (Working name)
- THE SEVENTY CHAMBER CHOIR OF THANET (Previous name)
- THE SEVENTY CHOIR (Previous name)
- THE SEVENTY CHOIR OF THANET (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW HILLIER | Chair | 02 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Christina Maxted | Trustee | 18 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Nightingale | Trustee | 18 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ellie Andrassy | Trustee | 15 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Chappell | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Myhill | Trustee | 14 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
IONA McINTOSH | Trustee | 17 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET TILBURY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.28k | £2.77k | £6.68k | £16.97k | £11.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.85k | £3.15k | £7.19k | £16.19k | £8.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 17 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 31 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 2ND JULY 1979 AS AMENDED 16TH JANUARY 1982 AND 18TH JANUARY 1986, AS AMENDED 14TH OCTOBER 2002 AND 13TH OCTOBER 2003, AS AMENDED ON 13 NOV 2017
Charitable objects
THE AIM AND PURPOSE OF THE CHOIR SHALL BE THE STUDY AND PRACTICE OF CHORAL MUSIC WITH A PARTICULAR EMPHASIS ON CHORAL CHAMBER MUSIC, TO FOSTER PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE AND APPRECIATION OF SUCH MUSIC BY MEANS OF PUBLIC PERFORMANCE.
Area of benefit
THANET
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 Salisbury Avenue
RAMSGATE
Kent
CT11 7LH
- Phone:
- 01843582146
- Email:
- thanetchamberchoir@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window