Accounts and annual returns THE KAY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 279060
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2011 09 October 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2011 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2010 13 August 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2010 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2009 17 August 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2009 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2008 18 August 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2008 Not Required