GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY OF BRISTOL

Charity Number: 279079
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To promote the Greek Orthodox faith and Greek language, within Bristol and the neibourhood. To assist individuals of all ages along the Christian faith principals and undertake charitable activities that safeguard man kind and the environment avoiding discrimination of any kind.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £186,616
Total expenditure: £193,349

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Bristol City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 January 1980: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Archbishop Nikitas Lioulias Trustee 12 June 2019
THE GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY OF COVENTRY
Received: On time
GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY OF ST CONSTANTINE AND ST HELEN
Received: On time
THE GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY OF HOLY ANARGYRI TRUST
Received: On time
ST JOHN THE BAPTIST GREEK ORTHODOX TRUST
Received: On time
GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY OF ST KATHERINE
Received: On time
ST NICHOLAS GREEK ORTHODOX EDUCATIONAL CENTRE
Received: On time
GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY OF WESTON-SUPER-MARE
Received: On time
THE GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY OF ST JOHN CHRYSOSTOM IN CHELTENHAM AND ENVIRONS
Received: On time
GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY OF BIRMINGHAM
Received: 90 days late
GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY OF ST GEORGE THE MARTYR
Received: On time
Sts. Barbara, Phanourius and Paul the Apostle Greek Orthodox Church
Received: On time
SAINT NICHOLAS GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY TRUST
Received: On time
GREEK ORTHODOX ARCHDIOCESE OF THYATEIRA AND GREAT BRITAIN
Received: On time
ECCLESIASTICAL AND THEOLOGICAL SEMINARY OF THE ARCHDIOCESE OF THYATEIRA AND GREAT BRITAIN
Received: On time
THE GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY THE TWELVE APOSTLES HERTFORDSHIRE TRUST
Received: On time
THE GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY - THE TWELVE APOSTLES (HERTFORDSHIRE)
Received: On time
ST BARNABAS GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY FUND
Received: On time
GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY OF MILTON KEYNES AND SURROUNDING DISTRICT
Received: On time
Michael John Michael Trustee 07 January 2018
None on record
IOANNIS IEROPOULOS Trustee 12 December 2013
None on record
MARIA SAVVAS Trustee 12 December 2013
None on record
HECTOR STAMBOULIEH Trustee
None on record
MR NICOS NICOLAOU Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £171.61k £132.57k £793.66k £221.32k £186.62k
Total expenditure £173.97k £140.13k £204.94k £197.28k £193.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £7.43k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £89.24k N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £629.61k N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £36.95k N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A £37.86k N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £139.65k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £65.29k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 27 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 27 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 17 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 17 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 30 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 30 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 29 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 29 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 31 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
LARKOS & PARTNERS
128 STOKE LANE
WESTBURY-ON-TRYM
BRISTOL
BS9 3RJ
Phone:
01179739335