THE AYLESBURY TALKING NEWSPAPER

Charity number: 279092
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Aylesbury Talking Newspaper

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024

Total income: £152
Total expenditure: £489

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Buckinghamshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 March 1980: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • AYLESBURY TALKING NEWSPAPER (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ALAN DRAKE Chair
None on record
TONY HAWKINS Trustee
None on record
CAROLINE CASTLE Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £530 £25 £319 £104 £152
Total expenditure £919 £315 £417 £511 £489
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 19 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2023 21 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2022 21 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2021 02 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2020 13 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
4 Cricketers Way
Haddenham
AYLESBURY
Buckinghamshire
HP17 8FL
Phone:
01296688069
Website:

No information available