RINGSHALL VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Annual fete, weekly carpet bowls, bingo, drama, dog training, occasional caravan rallies, parties, craft fayre, quiz night, social evenings & jumble sales.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income includes £1,305 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Suffolk
Governance
- 02 January 1980: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BRIAN ALEXANDER ROBERTSON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Abigail Smith | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Jarrold | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Angela Rogers | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lacey Luther | Trustee | 22 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Jones | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
JULIE ANNE SMITH | Trustee | 24 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH JOY HITCHCOCK | Trustee | 24 August 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.95k | £6.17k | £6.02k | £11.31k | £21.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.61k | £11.93k | £9.13k | £11.31k | £24.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £4.67k | £1.31k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 18 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 28 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 03 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 30 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 26/07/1979 AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 18/03/1981
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR USE OF INHABITANTS OF PARISH OF RINGSHALL WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATIONS WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF RINGSHALL
Contact information
- Address:
-
PRITHIPURA
LOWER FARM ROAD
RINGSHALL
STOWMARKET
IP14 2JE
- Phone:
- 01473658535
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window