Financial history NAVESTOCK VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 279129
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £16.63k £20.24k £26.21k £16.22k £14.09k
Total expenditure £17.21k £14.52k £22.14k £13.31k £18.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £15.00k £15.44k £2.50k N/A