THE SENIOR CITIZENS' CLUB OF CHIGWELL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Club organises a monthly meeting at a local hall with a lunch provided and recreational activities. The Club also organises day outings during the year to local resorts and places of interest. A small subsidy is provided by the club for each outing.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

14 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
Governance
- 24 January 1980: Standard registration
No other names
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Avice Mason | Chair | 06 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Brijpal Bedi | Trustee | 04 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Elspeth Carstairs | Trustee | 04 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ann Greenaway | Trustee | 06 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Maureen Girling | Trustee | 06 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ellie Miller | Trustee | 06 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mary Tidmarsh | Trustee | 06 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rita MacArthur | Trustee | 06 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
June Caslaw | Trustee | 06 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Doreen Oak | Trustee | 06 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Girling | Trustee | 04 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paul Mathias | Trustee | 04 March 2020 |
|
|||||
John Barber | Trustee | 03 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT FLEMING | Trustee | 06 January 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.93k | £6.23k | £9.27k | £15.47k | £15.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.41k | £963 | £6.86k | £10.83k | £13.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 09 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 07 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 November 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10TH DECEMBER 1979 as amended on 06 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF THE AGED IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW IS OR MAY HEREAFTER BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE.
Area of benefit
CHIGWELL
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 Valentine Avenue
WITHAM
Essex
CM8 2ZT
- Phone:
- 07528550425
- Email:
- ROBERTFLEMING880@GMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window