Financial history THE GUARDIAN TRUST

Charity number: 279168
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £223 £116 £216 £288 £71
Total expenditure £300 £250 £200 £150 £10.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A