Trustees THAKEHAM VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 279177

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN BEARMAN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Keith Robert Abbott | Trustee | 03 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Derrick Randall | Trustee | 06 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Kirkwood | Trustee | 06 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Watkins | Trustee | 06 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Cecily Mary Linfield | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Instance | Trustee | 06 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
David MacEachern | Trustee | 02 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
NORMAN PRINCE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BARRY CHARLES LAKER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.