Financial history SHAPE LONDON

Charity number: 279184
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £923.01k £2.06m £1.32m £656.51k £874.15k
Total expenditure £1.06m £1.69m £1.57m £643.87k £981.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £732.63k £1.39m £997.82k £271.83k £809.05k
Income - Donations and legacies £289.46k £371.10k £295.69k £5.10k £344.21k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £26.25k £3.03k
Income - Charitable activities £633.36k £1.69m £1.02m £623.65k £523.89k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £184 £133 £49 £1.45k £3.02k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £55 £0
Income - Legacies £1.79k £47.11k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.06m £1.69m £1.57m £643.77k £981.98k
Expenditure - Raising funds £5.87k £645 £375 £100 £0
Expenditure - Governance £25.45k £26.87k £28.62k £20.20k £19.62k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0