THE ARMOURERS AND BRASIERS GAUNTLET TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trustees make a number of individual small grants in support of education, materials science and general charitable purposes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 21 January 1980: Standard registration
- THE GAUNTLET TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHARLES HONNYWILL | Trustee | 27 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Dr Geoffrey Andrews | Trustee | 29 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Goulette | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Emma Ream | Trustee | 25 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Davies | Trustee | 28 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Professor WILLIAM BONFIELD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.29m | £366.70k | £361.58k | £435.65k | £394.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £400.11k | £1.29m | £400.79k | £342.35k | £397.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.02m | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £8.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £254.96k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £374.09k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £26.02k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £6.55k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £218.56k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £26.02k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 21ST NOVEMBER 1979
Charitable objects
THE SUPPORT OF ALL OR ANY CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS OR PURPOSES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
ARMOURERS HALL
81 COLEMAN STREET
LONDON
EC2R 5BJ
- Phone:
- 02073744000
- Email:
- clerk@armourershall.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window