Accounts and annual returns BRISTOL-HANNOVER COUNCIL

Charity number: 279212
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 14 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 12 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 05 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 19 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 03 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required