BRISTOL-HANNOVER COUNCIL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To support activities of young people in Bristoland the surrounding area in visits and exchanges to and from Hannover,Germany, and to encourage cultural and sporting activities associated with the city of Hannover and its surrounding area
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bristol City
Governance
- 13 February 1980: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr ANN KENNARD | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Dr IAN TURNER | Trustee | 23 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
IRENA GORZYNSKA | Trustee | 21 October 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.68k | £1.19k | £600 | £1.44k | £2.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.25k | £87 | £534 | £2.22k | £1.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30TH OCTOBER 1979 AS AMENDED 11 SEPTEMBER 1996
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY ORGANISING AND FACILITATING EDUCATIONAL EXCHANGES BETWEEN SCHOOL CHILDREN AND EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTIONS IN AND AROUND THE CITY OF BRISTOL WITH SCHOOL CHILDREN AND SIMILAR INSTITUTIONS IN AND AROUND HANNOVER IN THE FEDERAL REPUBLIC OF GERMANY.
Area of benefit
CITY OF BRISTOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
81 Shurdington Road
CHELTENHAM
GL53 0JQ
- Phone:
- 07742624131
- Email:
- paul.hinchcliffe@uwe.ac.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window