THE UNITED REFORMED CHURCH HISTORY SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of the Journal for members and others; holding annual meetings for study of the United Reformed Church and the traditions from which it comes; provision of an enquiry service for the public, both at home and abroad; care of archives for the Church and provision of library services; the making of grants to members of the public intending to publish relevant research.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 06 February 1980: Standard registration
- CHURCHES OF CHRIST HISTORICAL SOCIETY (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Revd Dr DAVID GEORGE CORNICK | Chair | 08 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Dr Simone Maghenzani | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Dr ANNE SAMSON | Trustee | 08 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||||
JEAN MARGARET WYBER | Trustee | 16 November 2017 |
|
|||||||||||||
Rev FLEUR ST CLAIR HOUSTON | Trustee | 23 July 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||||
JOHN GEORGE ELLIS | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|||||||||||||
Rev MICHAEL JAGESSAR | Trustee | 05 July 2014 |
|
|
||||||||||||
REVD DR ROBERT PHILIP POPE | Trustee | 03 September 2011 |
|
|
||||||||||||
REVD DR MICHAEL HOPKINS | Trustee | 03 July 2009 |
|
|||||||||||||
REV PROF DAVID MICHAEL THOMPSON MA PHD BD | Trustee | 16 September 2005 |
|
|||||||||||||
REVD CHRIS DAMP | Trustee | 16 September 2005 |
|
|
||||||||||||
PROFESSOR CLYDE BINFIELD | Trustee | 05 September 2005 |
|
|
||||||||||||
REVD DR KIRSTY THORPE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.03k | £5.62k | £6.49k | £10.86k | £9.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.19k | £2.32k | £3.17k | £11.68k | £3.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 31ST JULY 1979 AS AMENDED ON THE 17TH SEPTEMBER 2005
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE SOCIETY SHALL BE TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH, AND IN PARTICULAR; (A) TO ENCOURAGE INTEREST IN AND TO PROMOTE THE STUDY OF THE HISTORY OF THE UNITED REFORMED CHURCH WITH ITS ANTECEDENTS WITHIN THE CONGREGATIONAL, PRESBYTERIAN AND CHURCHES OF CHRIST TRADITIONS AND RELATED MOVEMENTS AND CHURCHES, THEIR ORIGINS, PRINCIPLES, THEOLOGY, CHURCHES AND MISSIONS; (B) TO PUBLISH A JOURNAL REGULARLY, AND SUCH OTHER PUBLICATIONS AS THE COUNCIL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE; (C) TO PROVIDE AN ANNUAL LECTURE; (D) TO ENCOURAGE THE COLLECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HISTORICAL RECORDS AND WHERE APPROPRIATE TO ACT AS CUSTODIAN, BY ARRANGEMENT WITH THE UNITED REFORMED CHURCH, OF MANUSCRIPTS, BOOKS, PORTRAITS, PAINTINGS AND OTHER RELEVANT OBJECTS BELONGING TO THE CHURCH; (E) TO MAKE GRANTS FOR THE PURSUIT OF HISTORICAL STUDIES IN CONNECTION WITH THE CHURCHES AND MOVEMENTS REFERRED TO IN (A).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
WESTMINSTER COLLEGE
MADINGLEY ROAD
CAMBRIDGE
CB3 0AA
- Phone:
- 01223362500
- Email:
- jeanwyber@aol.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window