Financial history Devon Orthopaedic Trust

Charity Number: 279222
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £10.19k £696 £36.20k £267 £2.78k
Total expenditure £1.75k £46.63k £5.49k £1.56k £1.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A