THE VEGAN SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE VEGAN SOCIETY PROMOTES A WAY OF LIFE THAT SEEKS TO AVOID, AS FAR AS IS POSSIBLE AND PRACTICABLE, ALL FORMS OF EXPLOITATION OF, AND CRUELTY TO, ANIMALS FOR FOOD, CLOTHING OR ANY OTHER PURPOSE. IT IS AN EDUCATION CHARITY PROVIDING INFORMATION AND SUPPORT THROUGH PUBLICATIONS, TALKS, INTERVIEWS, WEBSITES AND SOCIAL MEDIA. THE SOCIETY ADVOCATES FOR ALL, INCLUDING THOSE IN VULNERABLE SITUATIONS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£4,728,038
Donations and legacies | £328.95k | |
Charitable activities | £4.38m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £14.32k | |
Other | £2.89k |
Total expenditure:
£4,100,673
Raising funds | £46.27k | |
Charitable activities | £4.05m | |
Other | £0 |
£8,576 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £46.27k | |
Charitable expenditure | £4.05m | |
Retained for future use | £627.37k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £46.27k | |
Charitable expenditure | £4.05m | |
Retained for future use | £635.94k |
People

67 Employee(s)
7 Trustee(s)
141 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 27 December 1979: Standard registration
- THE VEGAN SOCIETY LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Chapman Samuel Chen | Trustee | 18 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paras Shah | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mx Christine Zuleka Audrey McLaren | Trustee | 21 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paula Eileen Feehan | Trustee | 21 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amber Vincent-Prior | Trustee | 21 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Hedley Gore | Trustee | 28 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jenifer Mary Vinell | Trustee | 27 June 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.08m | £3.47m | £3.99m | £4.30m | £4.73m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.58m | £3.17m | £4.19m | £4.38m | £4.10m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.00k | £42.93k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £676.71k | £451.53k | £232.21k | £315.89k | £328.95k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £12.19k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £2.37m | £2.99m | £3.74m | £3.97m | £4.38m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £20.53k | £22.31k | £1.97k | £8.10k | £14.32k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £5.00k | £12.89k | £4.57k | £2.89k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £390.04k | £121.55k | £16.50k | £37.60k | £55.63k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.52m | £3.10m | £4.14m | £4.35m | £4.05m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £58.23k | £66.66k | £54.42k | £25.66k | £46.27k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £39.58k | £27.80k | £85.65k | £13.93k | £9.96k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £357.44k | £311.25k | £371.14k | £441.03k | £601.37k | |
|
Long-term investments | £71.69k | £85.58k | £97.99k | £80.22k | £88.80k | |
|
Other assets | £1.61m | £2.10m | £1.92m | £1.69m | £2.27m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £232.99k | £409.28k | £492.39k | £439.31k | £553.72k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 04 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 27/12/1979 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/10/1981 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/11/1985 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/10/1987 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/09/1988 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/12/1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/11/1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/12/1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/11/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/10/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/10/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/11/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/11/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/11/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/11/2010 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 29/12/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/11/2013 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 12/12/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/06/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28 MAY 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20 MAY 2017 as amended on 19 May 2018 as amended on 18 May 2019 as amended on 18 May 2019 as amended on 18 May 2019 as amended on 15 Aug 2020 as amended on 22 May 2021 as amended on 21 May 2022
Charitable objects
(A) TO FURTHER KNOWLEDGE OF AND INTEREST IN SOUND NUTRITION AND IN VEGANISM AND THE VEGAN METHOD OF AGRICULTURE AS A MEANS OF INCREASING THE POTENTIAL OF THE EARTH TO THE PHYSICAL, MORAL AND ECONOMIC ADVANTAGE OF HUMANKIND. (B) TO RELIEVE ELDERLY VEGANS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o The Vegan Society
Donald Watson House
21 Hylton Street
Birmingham
B18 6HJ
- Phone:
- 0121 5231730
- Email:
- info@vegansociety.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window