MOLESWORTH VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 279275
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provide events where the village can come together as a community

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £5,404
Total expenditure: £5,140

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Cambridgeshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 February 1982: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PETE LEDGER Chair
None on record
Stephen Scott Trustee 17 May 2023
None on record
JOHN PRENTIS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £724 £5.09k £6.72k £5.35k £5.40k
Total expenditure £1.15k £3.30k £3.59k £5.53k £5.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 07 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 26 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 09 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 14 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 12 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
THE BRAMBLES
MOLESWORTH
HUNTINGDON
PE28 0QF
Phone:
01832710552
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available