THE SHROTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Manage and maintain the Hall and it's resources for the general benefit of the residents of the Parish of Iwerne Courtney. Organise functions and events and facilitate use of Hall by other village organisations and parishioners private events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Dorset
Governance
- 04 July 1980: Standard registration
- SHROTON VILLAGE HALL COMMITTEE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Karen Holliday | Trustee | 07 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Mark Maguire | Trustee | 26 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
JOHN CLIVE HEDGER | Trustee | 26 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Holmes | Trustee | 02 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emma Mary House | Trustee | 02 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Briggs | Trustee | 02 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
WENDY ANNE GREDLEY | Trustee | 06 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.37k | £3.46k | £3.35k | £8.24k | £16.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.48k | £4.79k | £3.87k | £8.57k | £14.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 08 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 March 2022 | 128 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1ST OCTOBER 1979 as amended on 12 Jun 2024
Charitable objects
TO ESTABLISH AND USE AS A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF HE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF SHROTON (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE AREA OF BENEFIT) WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS LICTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
SHROTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
EDENFIELD
FAIRFIELD ROAD
SHROTON
BLANDFORD FORUM
DT11 8QA
- Phone:
- 07983 464202
- Email:
- emmahouse1@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window