THE PETERBOROUGH CIVIC SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objectives of the Society is to promote high standards of planning, civic pride, public education in the geography, history and architecture within Peterborough. Also to secure protection and to preserve the development and improvement of features of historic, cultural or public interest throughout the city and its' environs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lincolnshire
- Northamptonshire
- Peterborough City
Governance
- 20 March 1980: Standard registration
- THE PETERBOROUGH CIVIC SOCIETY (Working name)
- THE PETERBOROUGH SOCIETY (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alderman Christabel Margaret Saltmarsh | Trustee | 03 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jean Elizabeth Bower | Trustee | 03 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER DAVID ASH | Trustee | 10 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Derek Frederick John Brown | Trustee | 03 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Roger Davis | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Toby Wood | Trustee | 01 January 2000 |
|
|
||||
PETER CLAUD SARGENT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HENRY MANSELL DUCKETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
THOMAS DAVID JOST | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID MICHAEL TURNOCK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JEREMY ROBERTS | Trustee |
|
||||||
PETER GRAHAM LEE | Trustee |
|
||||||
IAN COLIN WEBB | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.83k | £9.07k | £8.29k | £9.41k | £9.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.01k | £9.14k | £5.78k | £8.10k | £6.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 04 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 06 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 09 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 8TH OCTOBER 1979 AS AMENDED 15TH OCTOBER 1980 AS AMENDED ON 11 JAN 2021
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES ARE TO: A. PROMOTE HIGH STANDARDS OF PLANNING, CIVIC AMENITY AND ARCHITECTURE IN OR AFFECTING THE PETERBOROUGH AREA B. EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE GEOGRAPHY, HISTORY, NATURAL HISTORY AND ARCHITECTURE OF THE PETERBOROUGH AREA C. SECURE THE PRESERVATION, PROTECTION, DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF FEATURES OF HISTORIC, CULTURAL OR PUBLIC INTEREST IN THE PETERBOROUGH AREA.
Area of benefit
PETERBOROUGH AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Nene Way
Sutton
Peterborough
PE5 7XB
- Phone:
- 01780 782703
- Email:
- peter.g.lee@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window