Financial history FRIENDS OF HOUGHTON PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity number: 279312
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £4.64k £4.33k £5.24k £10.42k £5.17k
Total expenditure £5.20k £4.62k £1.43k £12.70k £5.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A