FRIENDS OF HOUGHTON PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fund raising for the benefit of the school and children through a variety of events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 25 March 1980: Standard registration
- HOUGHTON SCHOOL PTA (Working name)
- FRIENDS OF HOUGHTON SCHOOL (Previous name)
- HOUGHTON SCHOOL PARENT-TEACHER ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Chloe Bower-Sloane | Chair | 21 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rebekah Rose Baker | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Louise Fordham | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Clark-Frew | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Clare Anderson | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Claire Hudson | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Holly Ireland | Trustee | 21 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Marie Snow | Trustee | 05 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sally Dowling | Trustee | 05 October 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.64k | £4.33k | £5.24k | £10.42k | £5.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.20k | £4.62k | £1.43k | £12.70k | £5.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 27 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 18 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 15 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 19 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 14 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION DATED 2ND JANUARY 1980, AS AMENDED 18TH SEPTEMBER 1991 AS AMENDED ON 17 OCT 2017 as amended on 05 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE ASSOCIATION (THE OBJECTS) IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Area of benefit
HOUGHTON PRIMARY SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Houghton Primary School
Chapel Lane
Houghton
Huntingdon
Huntingdon
- Phone:
- 01480 463398
- Email:
- friendshoughton@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window