THE HISTORICAL METALLURGY SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide a forum for research and exchange of information on all aspects of past metallurgy, in Britain and worldwide. We also aim to promote the understanding and conservation of all aspects of the heritage relevant to metallurgy. Our interests range from prehistory to the present, and from extraction and smelting to all aspects of metalworking and the use of metals in society.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

19 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 20 March 1980: Standard registration
- HMS (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Michael Charlton | Chair | 11 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Ethan Samuel Greenwood | Trustee | 18 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Berber Sanderijn van der Meulen | Trustee | 18 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Hayden Scott-Pratt | Trustee | 18 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Florian Tereygeol | Trustee | 08 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Michael Edmund John Birch | Trustee | 17 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Raluca Ioana Lazarescu | Trustee | 13 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Therese Christina Kearns | Trustee | 13 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Maria Florencia Becerra | Trustee | 13 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Rowan Oliver Clement Taylor | Trustee | 13 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Eric Alexander Scott Nordgren | Trustee | 13 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Vanessa Cheel | Trustee | 11 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Thomas Rose | Trustee | 11 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||
John Lincoln Mark Cranfield | Trustee | 05 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||
William Kynaston Hawkes | Trustee | 17 June 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Paul Rondelez | Trustee | 13 June 2015 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Jonathan Lech Prus | Trustee | 31 May 2014 |
|
|||||||
Dr PETER WICKHAM KING | Trustee |
|
||||||||
Dr JUSTINE CECILY BAYLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.48k | £20.45k | £58.04k | £18.97k | £14.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.29k | £21.32k | £18.17k | £6.92k | £4.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 February 2023 | 116 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 February 2023 | 116 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 March 2021 | 142 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08/08/1979 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/05/2012 as amended on 26 Sep 2019 as amended on 05 Jun 2021
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE ANDINSTRUCT THE PUBLIC BY THE FURTHERANCE OF THE STUDY, INVESTIGATION, DESCRIPTION AND PRESERVATION OF THE HISTORICAL AND ARCHAEOLOGICAL EVIDENCE OF THE EXTRACTION AND PREPARATION OF ORES AND OTHER RELEVANT MINERALS, OF THE SMELTING AND WORKING OF METALS, OF THE MANUFACTURE AND USE OF METAL OBJECTS AND OF OTHER RELEVANT ACTIVITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Dean Farm Oasthouse
Rushlake Green
Heathfield
TN21 9QU
- Phone:
- 01435830155
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window