MITRINOVIC FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the cultural, educational and social thinking of the late Dimitrije Mitrinovic.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 12 February 1980: Standard registration
- NEW ATLANTIS FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martin Levy | Trustee | 27 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Denise Heinrich Lane | Trustee | 24 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW JOSEPH RIGBY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr PHILIP CONFORD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DR M G TYLDESLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.92k | £1.83k | £1.68k | £1.76k | £1.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.21k | £1.86k | £3.61k | £3.18k | £4.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 06 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 01 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 03 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 01 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 29TH OCTOBER 1979 AS AMENDED 7 JULY 2010
Charitable objects
(A) THE PROMOTION AND ENCOURAGEMENT BY ALL CHARITABLE MEANS OF THE STUDY OF PILOSOPHY SPIRITUAL SCIENCE AND COMPARATIVE RELIGION. (B) TO DO ALL SUCH THINGS AS SHALL FURTHER THE ABOVE OBJECTS OR ANY OF THEM.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 Chorlton Park Flats
417 Barlow Moor Road
Chorlton cum Hardy
MANCHESTER
M21 8JD
- Phone:
- 07751599714
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window