CAMESTONE LOWER SCHOOL PARENT-TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FUNDRAISING TO SUPPORT SCHOOL ACTIVITIES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bedford
Governance
- 20 March 1980: Standard registration
- 09 January 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- 11 October 2011: Re-registered
- CAMESTONE P T A (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cheryl Horsley | Chair | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claire Roberts | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Aylott | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Caves | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.23k | £7.55k | £0 | £2.39k | £7.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.33k | £9.24k | £2.66k | £1.17k | £6.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 06 September 2024 | 98 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 24 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 06 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 10 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6TH OCTOBER 1977 AMENDED 10TH OCTOBER 1978
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL (NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE EDUCATION AUTHORITY).
Area of benefit
CAMESTONE SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Jowitt Avenue
Kempston
BEDFORD
MK42 8NW
- Phone:
- 01234855587
- Email:
- ptfa@camestoneschool.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window