ALL SAINTS MILTON KEYNES RESTORATION FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
All Saints Church Restoration Fund
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Buckinghamshire
- Milton Keynes
Governance
- 20 March 1980: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALISON CORLETT | Trustee | 08 February 2021 |
|
|||||
Wayne Webb | Trustee | 17 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Sawyer | Trustee | 18 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
IAN CORLETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GEOFF DAWE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £78 | £72 | £1.34k | £88 | £121 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 17TH DECEMBER 1979
Charitable objects
FOR OR TOWARDS THE COST AND EXPENSES INCURRED BY THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL IN THE RESTORATION, REPAIR AND MAINTENANCE (INCLUDING RELATED IMPROVEMENTS) OF ALL OR ANY PART OR PARTS OF THE FABRIC AND ORNAMENTS AND FIXTURES AND FITTINGS AND CONTENTS OF THE PARISH CHURCH AND THE MAINTENANCE OF THE CHURCHYARD AS AS A WHOLE.
Area of benefit
THE PARISH OF ALL SAINTS IN MILTON KEYNES VILLAGE
Contact information
- Address:
-
TOBY COTTAGE
BROUGHTON
MILTON KEYNES
MK10 9AA
- Phone:
- 01908231445
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window