Trustees MANNINGTREE AND MISTLEY WELCOME HOME AND MEMORIAL FUND
Charity number: 279401

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Connie Besant-Gull | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Philip Cunningham | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian Leveridge | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Coiley | Trustee | 03 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Faye Kent | Trustee | 18 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paul Nutter | Trustee | 25 November 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.