WINTERBOURNE GLEBE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To maintain winterbourne glebe hall for the communal benefit of the inhabitants of the winterbourne villages and its surrounds.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £347 from 1 government grant(s)
People

12 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 06 March 1980: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR G LLOYD | Chair |
|
|
|||||
David Arthur Rees | Trustee | 24 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Roger John Morgan | Trustee | 12 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Emma Louise Marsh | Trustee | 12 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Richard Moores | Trustee | 12 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Jean Taylor | Trustee | 08 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rosalind Haigh | Trustee | 09 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Philomena Sankey | Trustee | 12 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
JILLIAN LESLEY BARRETT | Trustee | 08 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
MAUREEN ELIZABETH ATKINSON | Trustee |
|
||||||
MRS H SHEPHERD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
WINTERBOURNE PARISH COUNCIL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.16k | £17.22k | £29.74k | £19.58k | £21.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.38k | £12.78k | £15.91k | £22.01k | £24.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.80k | £17.48k | £2.67k | £347 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE AND TRUST DEED DATED 11TH NOVEMBER 1992
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF WINTERBOURNE WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF WINTERBOURNE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Twingley
The Portway
Winterbourne Gunner
Salisbury
SP4 6JL
- Phone:
- 01980611311
- Email:
- maureenatkinson16@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window