Trustees WINTERBOURNE GLEBE HALL
Charity number: 279405

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR G LLOYD | Chair |
|
|
|||||
David Arthur Rees | Trustee | 24 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Roger John Morgan | Trustee | 12 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Emma Louise Marsh | Trustee | 12 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Richard Moores | Trustee | 12 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Jean Taylor | Trustee | 08 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rosalind Haigh | Trustee | 09 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Philomena Sankey | Trustee | 12 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
JILLIAN LESLEY BARRETT | Trustee | 08 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
MAUREEN ELIZABETH ATKINSON | Trustee |
|
||||||
MRS H SHEPHERD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
WINTERBOURNE PARISH COUNCIL | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.