WYVERN LODGE BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support of Local Charities by selective donation, in a manor appropiate to the charity, usally amonetrie donation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2017
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Other Finance
- Other Charitable Activities
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 14 March 1980: Standard registration
- 11 July 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- 12 August 2011: Re-registered
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR R G REED | Chair |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.86k | £6.10k | £4.33k | £4.93k | £6.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.89k | £5.88k | £4.67k | £5.62k | £4.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 183 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 183 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 549 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 549 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 914 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 914 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1279 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1279 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1644 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1644 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 14TH JULY 1976
Charitable objects
TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH DISTRESSED BROTHER MASONS OR THEIR DISTRESSED WIDOWS AND CHILDREN OR TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH MASONIC CHARITIES OR OTHER CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS SOCIETIES AND OBJECTS AS THE LODGE SHALL IN DULY CONSTITUTED MEETING FROM TIME TO TIME DIRECT.
Area of benefit
WARMINSTER
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 WYLYE ROAD
WARMINSTER
BA12 9PE
- Phone:
- 01985215361
- Email:
- enactbob@blueyonder.co.uk
- Website:
-
Wyvern.Lodge
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window