THE GEORGE AND MARY CROSFIELD CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 279427
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Making contributions to religious and educational bodies or other legal charities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £6,821
Total expenditure: £7,275

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 March 1980: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JAMES MATTHEW CROSFIELD Chair
None on record
WILLIAM PHILIP JOHN BAILEY Trustee
None on record
OLIVIA KATE RADFORD Trustee
None on record
HENRY CHARLES ARCHER Trustee
None on record
MRS POLLY STEVENSON Trustee
None on record
MR CHRIS BAILEY Trustee
None on record
NICHOLAS DAVID NIGEL BAILEY Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £6.00k £5.80k £5.70k £6.28k £6.82k
Total expenditure £6.41k £6.30k £6.65k £6.05k £7.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 19 February 2025 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 19 June 2024 135 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 07 February 2023 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 08 March 2022 31 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 13 March 2021 36 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
14 WOODSIDE AVENUE
YORK
YO31 0QS
Phone:
01904337473
Website:

No information available