Financial history THE JEWELL FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 279441
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £584 £653 £653 £653 £653
Total expenditure £582 £651 £651 £651 £651
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A